Global patent index - EP 0957238 B1

EP 0957238 B1 2001-04-11 - Valve spring in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve spring in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventilfeder in einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Ressort de soupape dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0957238 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98303772 A

Priority

EP 98303772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957238A1] A valve spring (1) is used in a valve operating mechanism for moving a poppet valve (6) up and down in an internal combustion engine of an automobile. The terminal end of the uppermost portion (9) of the valve spring (1) extends in a tangential direction to go away from an axis of the valve spring (1), thereby avoiding contact with a retainer (2) to prevent wear. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/462 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957238 A1 19991117; EP 0957238 B1 20010411; DE 69800693 D1 20010517; DE 69800693 T2 20011011

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040513

2003-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030507

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000519

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991019

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI