Global Patent Index - EP 0957256 B1

EP 0957256 B1 2003-06-25 - Ring carrier for an internal combustion engine piston

Title (en)

Ring carrier for an internal combustion engine piston

Title (de)

Ringträger für einen Kolben eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Porteur-bague pour un piston d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0957256 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107244 A

Priority

DE 19821316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957256A2] The plate cooling channel (4) has a horizontal division. The two parts (5,6) of the plate cooling channel overlap in the are of the welding seam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957256 A2 19991117; EP 0957256 A3 20000412; EP 0957256 B1 20030625; DE 19821316 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI