Global Patent Index - EP 0957293 B1

EP 0957293 B1 2002-11-27 - Electromagnetic screw-nut actuator

Title (en)

Electromagnetic screw-nut actuator

Title (de)

Elektromagnetische Betätigungseinrichtung mit Gewindespindelantrieb

Title (fr)

Actionneur électro-mécanique du type à système vis/écrou

Publication

EP 0957293 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401141 A

Priority

FR 9805942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957293A1] The actuator has a rotatable screw and nut and guide rod moved by screw rotation. There are rollers between the guide rod and the nut, these rollers having grooves and edges, cooperating with similar ones on the nut and guide rod to allow free translation of the guide rod w.r.t the nut. The electro-mechanical actuator has a rotatable screw (1) and a nut (2) and guide rod (3) which are moved by rotation of the screw (1). The actuator has a number of rollers (4,5) interposed between the guide rod (3) and the nut (2). These rollers (4,5) has a succession of complementary annular throats and edges, whilst the external surface of the nut (2) and the internal surface of guide rod (3) have also a number of complementary throats and edges on them. The throats and edges of the rollers (4,5) cooperate with those on the nut (2) and guide rod (3) so as to transmit to the nut (2) the axial force on the guide rod (3) when the rollers (4,5) are in a held position. The nut (2) and/or the guide rod (3) have slots (2a) whose angular position is designed to coincide with those of the rollers (4,5) when they are released. These slots enable the disengagement of at least some of the throats and edges so as to free the guide rod (3) by movement with respect to the nut (2). The actuator includes means for displacing the rollers from their locked position to their released position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 25/20; B64C 13/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 13/50 (2006.01); F16H 25/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 25/2025 (2013.01); B64C 13/50 (2013.01); F16H 25/2252 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18704 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957293 A1 19991117; EP 0957293 B1 20021127; DE 69904110 D1 20030109; DE 69904110 T2 20030724; ES 2186310 T3 20030501; FR 2778797 A1 19991119; FR 2778797 B1 20000804; US 6237433 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186310 T3

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904110 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW SYSTEMES AERONAUTIQUES CIVILS

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI