Global Patent Index - EP 0957328 A3

EP 0957328 A3 2000-06-07 - Device for preheating a material web with spatial resolution

Title (en)

Device for preheating a material web with spatial resolution

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Vorwärmung einer Materialbahn mit hoher räumlicher Auflösung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le prechauffage avec resolution spatiale d'une bande de matiere

Publication

EP 0957328 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99108997 A

Priority

DE 19821222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957328A2] The preheater for an advancing strip of material made from smooth and/or corrugated layers is designed to heat the strip before applying adhesive and attaching another layer. It uses a heating element (14) which has a series of preheating sections (50, 50', 50, 50') which lie adjacent to one another across the strip of material, each being filled individually by a heat-carrying fluid, preferably steam. The heating element has a thrust face with convex curvature, preferably in an arc with radius 500 mm, and has supporting and covering plates (18, 20), the latter enclosing the cavities filled with the heat carrying fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 5/02; B31F 1/28; F28D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/28 (2006.01); F28D 11/02 (2006.01); F28F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 11/02 (2013.01); B31F 1/285 (2013.01); F28F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957328 A2 19991117; EP 0957328 A3 20000607; DE 19821222 A1 19991118; US 6298895 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030109

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI