Global Patent Index - EP 0957420 A3

EP 0957420 A3 2000-03-29 - Clamping circuit

Title (en)

Clamping circuit

Title (de)

Klemmschaltung

Title (fr)

Circuit de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0957420 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109644 A

Priority

DE 19821906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957420A2] The circuit has cross-coupled first and second transistors which switch from a normal mode to a clamp mode when the voltage of a signal delivered via an input path falls below a defined clamp voltage. A third transistor (M3) is connected in the input path (Vp) so that it is in the reverse conducting state in clamp mode and in the forward conducting state in normal mode. The third transistor is a D-MOS-FET, whose gate connector is connected to a supply voltage to switch the FET through.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/22 (2006.01); G05F 3/24 (2006.01); G05F 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/227 (2013.01); G05F 3/247 (2013.01); G05F 3/262 (2013.01); G05F 3/267 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957420 A2 19991117; EP 0957420 A3 20000329; EP 0957420 B1 20030416; DE 19821906 C1 20000302; US 6137278 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905031 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05F 3/22 A, 7G 11C 5/14 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI