Global Patent Index - EP 0957456 B1

EP 0957456 B1 2001-12-05 - MONNEY REFUND DEVICE FOR PAYMENT MECHANISMS

Title (en)

MONNEY REFUND DEVICE FOR PAYMENT MECHANISMS

Title (de)

RÜCKGELDVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZAHLUNGSMECHANISMEN

Title (fr)

RENDEUR DE MONNAIE POUR MECANISME DE PAIEMENT

Publication

EP 0957456 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97912225 A

Priority

  • ES 9700278 W
  • ES 9602491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824068A1] The money refund device of the invention comprises a coin receiving chamber of which the bottom or part of its wall is comprised of a rotating disk (1) which is traversed by retractable blades (7) capable of entraining the coins (3) during the rotation of the disk. Said blades are displaceable between an extracted position wherein they project partially from the disk surface to entrain the coins (3) and a retracted position wherein they do not project with respect to said surface. The blades (7) are elastically impulsed towards the extracted position and are displaced towards the retracted position when reaching the position of an arm or needle (5) which restricts the outlet opening for coins (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824068 A1 19980604; AR 010642 A1 20000628; AT 210326 T 20011215; AU 4949697 A 19980622; BR 9713420 A 20020115; CA 2272709 A1 19980604; CO 4770910 A1 19990430; DE 69708921 D1 20020117; DE 69708921 T2 20021002; EP 0957456 A1 19991117; EP 0957456 B1 20011205; ES 2119709 A1 19981001; ES 2119709 B1 19990701; ES 2168620 T3 20020616; HU 9903891 A2 20000328; HU 9903891 A3 20010528; JP 2001504623 A 20010403; NO 992496 A 19990720; NO 992496 D0 19990525; PE 9199 A1 19990216; PT 957456 E 20020531; TW 350945 B 19990121; ZA 9710549 B 19980612

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69708921

2017-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708921

- Representative's name: REBLE KLOSE SCHMITT PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160905

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120517

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AZKOYEN, S.A., PERALTA, ES

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AZKOYEN INDUSTRIAL S.A., PERALTA, NAVARRA, ES

- Document: DE 69708921

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708921

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708921

- Representative's name: REBLE KLOSE SCHMITT PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-05-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120517

2012-05-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AZKOYEN, S.A.

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-04-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708921

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101116

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-11-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021117

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168620 T3

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708921 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210326 T 20011215

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010108

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE