Global Patent Index - EP 0957464 A3

EP 0957464 A3 2000-09-13 - Method and device for disclosing current traffic information depending on direction of travel or stationary situation of vehicles

Title (en)

Method and device for disclosing current traffic information depending on direction of travel or stationary situation of vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Kenntlichmachung von fahrtrichtungsabhängigen oder stationären bzw. aktuellen Verkehrsinformationen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de divulgation d'informations sur le trafic, dépendant de la direction de circulation, ou bien fixes, respectivement actuelles

Publication

EP 0957464 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109533 A

Priority

DE 19821169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957464A2] The method uses at least two points or lines (1,2,3) in or on the road. The points or lines are placed at a definable distance from each other. The respective information is encoded by the respective distances between the points or lines and/or by magnetic, electric or other polarisation. The vehicle has a sensor device (10) and a sensor analyser (11) which detects the encoded information and marks it. Independent claims also cover an apparatus for carrying out the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09; G08G 1/0967

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/056 (2006.01); G08G 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/075 (2013.01); G08G 1/056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957464 A2 19991117; EP 0957464 A3 20000913; DE 19821169 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030613

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08G 1/09 A, 7G 08G 1/0967 B

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI