Global Patent Index - EP 0957479 A3

EP 0957479 A3 2001-12-19 - Digital video cassette recorder

Title (en)

Digital video cassette recorder

Title (de)

Digitaler Videocassettenrecorder

Title (fr)

Enregistreur pour cassette vidéo numérique

Publication

EP 0957479 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303547 A

Priority

JP 12748298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957479A2] A digital video cassette recorder comprising a plurality of heads provided on a rotary member and performing the recording/playback of the data on slanted tracks in performing helical scanning for a magnetic recording medium with the above mentioned heads, wherein the heads being composed of a first and a second heads being disposed opposing to each other at an angle of 180 DEG and a third head being disposed in a position at an angle of 270 DEG in the direction of rotation from the first head, having the same azimuth angle as that of the second head, the digital video cassette recorder also comprising a changeover switch for switching the first, the second and the third heads, and two modes having different data compression rates from each other, and in the first mode, recording/playback being performed in switching the first and the second heads alternately, and in the second mode, the tape feeding speed is made half and recording/playback being performed once in two rotations in switching the first and the third heads alternately. The fixing heights of heads on the rotary member are made to differ in every head, in order to reduce the difference in head outputs caused by the difference in azimuth angles related with the direction of orientation of the magnetic recording medium and the recording direction of the slanted tracks and to reduce the difference in head outputs caused by the imbalance of the side erase at the time of recording. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 15/12; G11B 5/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/09 (2006.01); G11B 5/008 (2006.01); G11B 5/53 (2006.01); G11B 15/12 (2006.01); G11B 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 15/1808 (2013.01); G11B 15/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957479 A2 19991117; EP 0957479 A3 20011219; EP 0957479 B1 20060719; CN 1235336 A 19991117; DE 69932380 D1 20060831; DE 69932380 T2 20070712; JP H11328639 A 19991130; KR 100639047 B1 20061027; KR 19990088151 A 19991227; TW 424233 B 20010301; US 6600871 B1 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080506

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932380 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI