Global patent index - EP 0957498 A3

EP 0957498 A3 2001-02-28 - Power window switch

Title (en)

Power window switch

Title (de)

Fensterheberschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de lève-vitre électrique

Publication

EP 0957498 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107947 A

Priority

  • DE 19820998 A
  • DE 19853818 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957498A2] The window switch (1) has an actuator element (2) pivotally mounted in a housing (6). The actuator actuates switch contacts (57) via an associated push switch member (35). Connector contacts (53) are associated with the switch contacts. Respective two stage pivotal movements (19) are associated with the actuator element (2) in the pushing direction for the downwards movement of the window and in the pulling direction for the upwards movement of the window. The actuator element (2) acts on deflectors (38,78) for a linear to and fro movement of the push switch member. This actuates, in each direction, successively, two switch contacts (57) of a switch pad (49).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/00; H01H 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/635 (2006.01); H01H 23/00 (2006.01); H01H 23/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/164 (2013.01); H01H 19/635 (2013.01); H01H 23/003 (2013.01); E05F 15/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/854 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/86 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/424 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01); H01H 2021/225 (2013.01); H01H 2300/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957498 A2 19991117; EP 0957498 A3 20010228; EP 0957498 B1 20060823; DE 59913787 D1 20061005; US 6054655 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100422

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100422

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-12-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913787

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI