Global Patent Index - EP 0957539 A3

EP 0957539 A3 2000-11-29 - Electrical connectors

Title (en)

Electrical connectors

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0957539 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100597 A

Priority

DE 29808527 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957539A2] The plug-in connector (1) has a plug component (2) contained within a drive housing (5) and provided with electrical connection lines (10) and a rotation blocking arm (11) for preventing its rotation about its longitudinal axis (7) relative to the drive housing, while allowing movement perpendicular to this axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/631; H01R 9/07; H01R 9/09; H01R 43/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/502 (2006.01); H01R 13/533 (2006.01); H01R 13/631 (2006.01); H01R 13/74 (2006.01); H01R 43/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/24 (2013.01); H01R 12/592 (2013.01); H01R 13/6315 (2013.01); H01R 12/58 (2013.01); H01R 13/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29808527 U1 19990923; EP 0957539 A2 19991117; EP 0957539 A3 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/631 A, 7H 01R 9/07 B, 7H 01R 9/09 B, 7H 01R 43/24 B

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI