Global Patent Index - EP 0957615 A3

EP 0957615 A3 2002-11-06 - Estimation and correction of clipping in a discrete multi-tone communications system

Title (en)

Estimation and correction of clipping in a discrete multi-tone communications system

Title (de)

Schätzung und Beseitigung von Begrenzungsverzerrung in einem Mehrträgervermittlungssystem

Title (fr)

Estimation et correction d'écrêtage dans un système de communication à tons multiples discrèts

Publication

EP 0957615 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201455 A

Priority

US 7641898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957615A2] A method for obtaining a reliable estimate of the transmitter clipping error compliant with T1.413 ADSL standard is disclosed. An architecture (110) is disclosed that uses the clipping error estimate at the receiver to reconstruct a frequency-domain compensation signal (EÄkÜ). The method for computing the compensation signal is disclosed along with an asymmetric digital subscriber line modem supporting T1.413 standard transmission/reception functions over a discrete multi-tone communications system capable of estimating clipping errors and computing clipping compensation signals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/2647 (2013.01); H04L 5/0044 (2013.01); H04L 5/006 (2013.01); H04L 27/2623 (2013.01); H04L 5/0007 (2013.01); H04L 27/2608 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4679227 A 19870707 - HUGHES-HARTOGS DIRK [US]
  • [X] GATHERER A ET AL: "Controlling clipping probability in DMT transmission", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS, 1997. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-FIRST ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA 2-5 NOV. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, 2 November 1997 (1997-11-02), pages 578 - 584, XP010280889, ISBN: 0-8186-8316-3
  • [X] BINGHAM J A C: "MULTICARRIER MODULATION FOR DATA TRANSMISSION: AN IDEA WHOSE TIME HAS COME", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, vol. 28, no. 5, 1 May 1990 (1990-05-01), pages 5 - 8,11-14, XP000132491, ISSN: 0163-6804

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957615 A2 19991117; EP 0957615 A3 20021106; US 2001000220 A1 20010412; US 2001001007 A1 20010510; US 6363109 B1 20020326; US 6363110 B1 20020326; US 6381268 B2 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031114

2004-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI