Global Patent Index - EP 0957661 A3

EP 0957661 A3 2000-09-06 - Electric cooking plate

Title (en)

Electric cooking plate

Title (de)

Elektrokochplatte

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson électrique

Publication

EP 0957661 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106973 A

Priority

DE 19821140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957661A2] A connector (31) has plug connection flag (35) with connection section to fix to a connecting lead (16) fed from the underside of the plate for energy supply to the plate. The cooking plate (11) has a connector (31) connected to the insulation piece (26) with a plug connection flag (35) in a slot (34) slightly bent away from a contact section (36). A welded flag (37) connects to a connecting lead (16) fed out from the underside of the cooking plate for energy supply. Neither connector nor flag protrude beyond an insert flange (17) of the plate, which is set into a slot in the cooker panel. Notches (32) are provided to attach the connector (31) to the plate or to a covering plate (21). The connector flag is connected by welding to the connecting lead. Coding notches on the connector or plug housing prevent twisting or mix up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/68; H05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/06 (2006.01); H05B 3/08 (2006.01); H05B 3/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/68 (2013.01); H05B 3/06 (2013.01); H05B 3/08 (2013.01); H05B 2203/016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957661 A2 19991117; EP 0957661 A3 20000906; EP 0957661 B1 20040630; EP 0957661 B2 20141015; DE 19821140 A1 19991118; DE 19821140 B4 20090827; DE 29924784 U1 20050811; DE 59909836 D1 20040805; ES 2224481 T3 20050301; ES 2224481 T5 20150107; HK 1023683 A1 20050121; SI 0957661 T1 20041231; SI 0957661 T2 20150130; TR 9901031 A2 19991221; TR 9901031 A3 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG HK AM43] AMENDMENT OF STANDARD PATENT FOLLOWING OPPOSITION OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS IN THE DESIGNATED PATENT OFFICE (ACC. SECT 43 PATENT ORDINANCE)

- Document: HK 1023683

2015-01-07 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2224481 T5

- Effective date: 20150107

2014-12-16 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2014-11-20 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59909836

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-10-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT SE

2014-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2014-10-15 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59909836

2008-01-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: EIKA, S. COOP.

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-06-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-05-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: EIKA, S. COOP.

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-05-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EIKA, S. COOP.

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224481 T3

2005-01-21 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1023683

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909836 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT SE

2004-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-09-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF AN ELECTRIC COOKING PLATE IN AN ELECTRIC RANGE AND ELECTRIC RANGE

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030404

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT SE

2001-05-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010210

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010210

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI