Global patent index - EP 0957714 B1

EP 0957714 B1 2001-01-24 - FLUSH-MOUNTED EXTRACTION GUIDE FOR DRAWERS ETC.

Title (en)

FLUSH-MOUNTED EXTRACTION GUIDE FOR DRAWERS ETC.

Title (de)

UNTERFLUR-AUSZIEHFÜHRUNG FÜR SCHUBLADEN ETC.

Title (fr)

COULISSE ENCASTREE DE GUIDAGE DE SORTIE POUR TIROIRS ETC.

Publication

EP 0957714 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96939016 A

Priority

  • DE 19543587 A
  • DE 19547931 A
  • DE 19601183 A
  • DE 19633241 A
  • EP 9604953 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6095626A] PCT No. PCT/EP96/04953 Sec. 371 Date Sep. 17, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date Sep. 17, 1998 PCT Filed Nov. 13, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/18732 PCT Pub. Date May 29, 1997A subsurface pullout guide (10) with a guiding rail (12), constructed as a profiled rail, which is to be fastened to the carcass wall, and with a running rail (26), which is disposed in the region of the bottom of the drawer and supported longitudinally displaceably on the guiding rail by rolling bodies (20, 22), which are held in a cage (24). A hollow profiled section, the cross section of which is identical with that of the running rail (26), is hinged to the end of the running rail (26) within the carcass so that it can be swiveled from a first position, aligned with the running rail and directly adjoining its end within the carcass, into a second position, which extends, on the other hand, essentially parallel to the rear wall of the drawer. Interacting guiding means are provided at the guiding rail and the pivotable hollow profiled section, which swivel the hollow profiled section (30) during the shifting of the running rail (26) on the guiding rail (12) from the end position, assigned to the completely pulled out position of the drawer, in the direction in which the drawer is pushed in, as its end in the carcass approaches the rear wall of the carcass, increasingly into the second position, which is essentially parallel to the rear wall of the drawer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/0462 (2013.01); A47B 88/0466 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29622864 U1 19970904; AT 198821 T 20010215; EP 0957714 A1 19991124; EP 0957714 B1 20010124; ES 2154845 T3 20010416; JP 2000501303 A 20000208; TW 404202 U 20000901; US 6095626 A 20000801; WO 9718732 A1 19970529

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071113

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061114

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061114

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031113

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-11-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031113

2002-11-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154845

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT SE

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198821

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000425

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980605

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT SE