Global patent index - EP 0957830 A4

EP 0957830 A4 2000-01-12 - IMPLANT PORT FOR BONE AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

IMPLANT PORT FOR BONE AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

KNOCHEN-IMPLANTAT MIT ZUGANGSÖFFNUNG UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

IMPLANT OSSEUX POUR ACCES REPETES ET UTILISATIONS DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 0957830 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96910661 A

Priority

  • US 9604350 W
  • US 41360395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2216614A1] An implant port for repeated access to the medullary portion of bone is provided. The implant port includes an access port (15, 13) that fits into a surgically constructed bone orifice and an insert means that seals and fills the port volume. A penetrable insert means (19) allows repeated access within bone using sharp instruments, while an adapter means (27) allows guided placement of a surgical instrument, such as a catheter, optical device, or rotating cutter. Skeletal surgery from the inside of bone is contemplated using the implant port provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/56 (2006.01); A61F 2/28 (2006.01); A61M 39/02 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 5379496 A 19961016; CA 2216614 A1 19961003; EP 0957830 A1 19991124; EP 0957830 A4 20000112; JP H11502750 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030131

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOMEDICAL ENTERPRISES, INC.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIOMEDICAL ENTERPRISES, INC.

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7A 61F 2/28 A, 7A 61B 17/34 B, 7A 61M 1/00 B

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971027

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE