Global Patent Index - EP 0957937 A4

EP 0957937 A4 2003-06-25 - VACCINES, ANTIBODIES, PROTEINS, GLYCOPROTEINS, DNAS AND RNAS FOR PROPHYLAXIS AND TREATMENT OF CRYPTOSPORIDIUM PARVUM INFECTIONS

Title (en)

VACCINES, ANTIBODIES, PROTEINS, GLYCOPROTEINS, DNAS AND RNAS FOR PROPHYLAXIS AND TREATMENT OF CRYPTOSPORIDIUM PARVUM INFECTIONS

Title (de)

IMPFSTOFFE, ANTIKÖRPER, PROTEINE, GLYCOPROTEINE, DNAS UND RNAS ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON CRYPTOSPORIDIUM PARVUM INFEKTIONEN

Title (fr)

VACCINS, ANTICORPS, PROTEINES, GLYCOPROTEINES, ADN ET ARN DE PROPHYLAXIE ET DE TRAITEMENT DES INFECTIONS PAR LE cryptosporidium parvum

Publication

EP 0957937 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97938238 A

Priority

  • US 9714104 W
  • US 70065196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806430A1] Vaccines, antibodies, proteins, glycoproteins, DNAs and RNAs useful for passive or active prophylaxis and treatment of Cryptosporidium infections. Cryptosporidium antigen comprised of a protein with or without carbohydrates attached thereto. Polyclonal and monoclonal antibodies directed against the antigen. DNA and RNA encoding the Cryptosporidium antigen, mutants, variants and fragments thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/395; A61K 39/40; A61K 39/42; A61K 39/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/44 (2006.01); C07K 16/20 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/20 (2013.01); C07K 14/44 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); Y02A 50/488 (2018.01); Y02A 50/489 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DOYLE P S ET AL: "Surface antigens of Cryptosporidium parvum sporozoites.", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, vol. 4, no. SUPPL., 1993, Thirty-third Annual Meeting of the American Society for Cell Biology;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; December 11-15, 1993, pages 202A, XP008016076, ISSN: 1059-1524
  • [DX] DOYLE P S ET AL: "Anti-Cryptosporidium parvum antibodies inhibit infectivity in vitro and in vivo.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY. UNITED STATES OCT 1993, vol. 61, no. 10, October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 4079 - 4084, XP002239225, ISSN: 0019-9567
  • [X] DATABASE MEDLINE [online] US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US; November 1991 (1991-11-01), PETERSEN C ET AL: "Characterization of a Cryptosporidium parvum sporozoite glycoprotein.", XP002239226, Database accession no. NLM1818168 & THE JOURNAL OF PROTOZOOLOGY. UNITED STATES 1991 NOV-DEC, vol. 38, no. 6, November 1991 (1991-11-01), pages 20S - 21S, ISSN: 0022-3921THE JOURNAL OF PROTOZOOLOGY. UNITED STATES 1991 NOV-DEC1991113860022-392120S21S
  • See also references of WO 9806430A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806430 A1 19980219; AU 4061797 A 19980306; EP 0957937 A1 19991124; EP 0957937 A4 20030625; US 6015882 A 20000118

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081015

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050712

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VACCINES, ANTIBODIES, PROTEINS, GLYCOPROTEINS, DNAS AND RNAS FOR PROPHYLAXIS AND TREATMENT OF CRYPTOSPORIDIUM PARVUM INFECTIONS

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETERSEN, CAROLYN

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEECH, JAMES

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NELSON, RICHARD, C. UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUT, JIRI

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990310

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT