Global Patent Index - EP 0957994 B1

EP 0957994 B1 2001-12-12 - LIFE SAVING APPARATUS FOR AVALANCHES

Title (en)

LIFE SAVING APPARATUS FOR AVALANCHES

Title (de)

LAWINENRETTUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE SAUVETAGE LORS D'AVALANCHES

Publication

EP 0957994 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98908020 A

Priority

  • DE 19703656 A
  • EP 9800491 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19703656A1] A life saving system (1) for avalanches has at least one inflatable buoyant body (2, 3) secured close to the body of the user, a filling unit (4, 5), a pressurised gas unit (6) with a pressurised gas container (7) and a triggering device (8). The filling unit (4, 5) is arranged within the buoyant body (2, 3). The filling unit can have an ejector nozzle for aspirating ambient air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 33/00; A62B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 99/00 (2009.01); A62B 33/00 (2006.01); A63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/021 (2013.01); A62B 33/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703656 A1 19980806; AT 210481 T 20011215; CA 2279273 A1 19980806; CA 2279273 C 20050412; EP 0957994 A1 19991124; EP 0957994 B1 20011212; JP 2002510987 A 20020409; JP 4095661 B2 20080604; US 6220909 B1 20010424; WO 9833559 A1 19980806

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210481 T

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-11-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802433

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802433 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210481 T 20011215

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE