Global Patent Index - EP 0958006 B1

EP 0958006 B1 2001-12-19 - ARMOUR WITH ROLLERS

Title (en)

ARMOUR WITH ROLLERS

Title (de)

MIT ROLLEN VERSEHENE RÜSTUNG

Title (fr)

ARMURE A ROULETTES

Publication

EP 0958006 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96920886 A

Priority

  • FR 9600829 W
  • FR 9506510 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9638208A1] Armour with rollers enabling the user to move in all positions by rolling on a hard and smooth surface, while varying constantly the bearing points on the ground, characterized in that it is comprised of an assembly of rigid holding parts (1, 2, 4, 6) fitted with rollers which are intended to be fixed to the members and/or trunk of the user.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/12; A41D 13/00; A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A63B 71/12 (2006.01); A63C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/04 (2013.01); A41D 13/0015 (2013.01); A63B 71/12 (2013.01); A63C 17/0026 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1208 (2013.01); A63B 2071/125 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1258 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1283 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9638208 A1 19961205; AT 211011 T 20020115; AU 6228596 A 19961218; DE 69618254 D1 20020131; DE 69618254 T2 20020814; EP 0958006 A1 19991124; EP 0958006 B1 20011219; FR 2734733 A1 19961206; FR 2734733 B1 19970829; JP H11505758 A 19990525; US 5926857 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-06-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030612

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618254 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB IT LI

2001-12-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211011 T 20020115

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971231

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB IT LI