Global Patent Index - EP 0958011 A4

EP 0958011 A4 2001-02-07 - SPORTS GAME OF SKILL AND CHANCE

Title (en)

SPORTS GAME OF SKILL AND CHANCE

Title (de)

GESCHICKLICHKEITS- UND GLÜCKSSPORTSPIEL

Title (fr)

JEU D'APTITUDE SPORTIVE ET DE HASARD

Publication

EP 0958011 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97945644 A

Priority

US 9720522 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2276355A1] A sweepstakes-type game in which pre-printed game cards (10) are distributed to contestants which permit the contestants to predict the performance of selected players (28a-28i) prior to an athletic event and which will reveal winning contestants and associated prizes (12a-12h) based upon the geometric arrangement and/or point value (36) of correct predictions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/04 (2006.01); A63F 3/06 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CA 2276355 A1 19990514; CA 2276355 C 20050802; EP 0958011 A1 19991124; EP 0958011 A4 20010207; JP 2001507272 A 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080503

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030909

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991025

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE