Global Patent Index - EP 0958219 B1

EP 0958219 B1 2001-05-23 - STACK CHANGING DEVICE

Title (en)

STACK CHANGING DEVICE

Title (de)

STAPELWECHSELVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF CHANGEUR DE PILES

Publication

EP 0958219 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98908045 A

Priority

  • DE 19704285 A
  • EP 9800568 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834861A1] In a non-stop stack changing device, remaining-stack bars are pulled from the stack area one by one and out-of-line in relation to each other. To this end, a pull/push drive is provided, which makes it possible to push the remaining-stack bars simultaneously into the grooves of a pallet carrying a sheet stack. Furthermore, the pull/push drive makes it possible to pull the remaining-stack bars in pairs from inside outwards out of the stack area. In addition, the remaining-stack bars can be pulled in a first and second sequence in accordance with this model. An individual motor drive is provided for this purpose, which operates interlockingly on each individual remaining-stack bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/30 (2006.01); B65H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/263 (2013.01); B65H 2403/00 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834861 A1 19980813; AT 201378 T 20010615; AT 205455 T 20010915; AT 206097 T 20011015; AT 206098 T 20011015; AT 207841 T 20011115; AT 209154 T 20011215; EP 0958215 A1 19991124; EP 0958215 B1 20011031; EP 0958216 A1 19991124; EP 0958216 B1 20010926; EP 0958217 A1 19991124; EP 0958217 B1 20010926; EP 0958218 A1 19991124; EP 0958218 B1 20010912; EP 0958219 A1 19991124; EP 0958219 B1 20010523; EP 0958220 A1 19991124; EP 0958220 B1 20011121; JP 2000509692 A 20000802; JP 2000509693 A 20000802; JP 2000509694 A 20000802; JP 2000509695 A 20000802; JP 2000510083 A 20000808; JP 2001505861 A 20010508; JP 3297442 B2 20020702; JP 3322888 B2 20020909; JP 3332936 B2 20021007; JP 3332937 B2 20021007; JP 3332938 B2 20021007; JP 3346478 B2 20021118; US 6209863 B1 20010403; US 6286826 B1 20010911; US 6485016 B1 20021126; US 6547512 B1 20030415; US 6547513 B1 20030415; US 6676364 B1 20040113; WO 9834862 A1 19980813; WO 9834863 A1 19980813; WO 9834864 A1 19980813; WO 9834865 A1 19980813; WO 9834866 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160203

2016-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201378 T

- Effective date: 20160203

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800760

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 201378 T

- Effective date: 20130906

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59800760

- Effective date: 20120510

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-02-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800760 20010628

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201378 T 20010615

2001-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000925

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981223

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE