EP 0958380 A4 20040317 - MACROMOLECULE-LIPID COMPLEXES AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING
Title (en)
MACROMOLECULE-LIPID COMPLEXES AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING
Title (de)
MAKROMOLEKUL-LIPID KOMPLEXE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG
Title (fr)
COMPLEXES MACROMOLECULE/LIPIDE ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 9722296 W 19971205
- US 3216396 P 19961206
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9824936A1] The invention provides novel compositions involving macromolecule-lipid complexes and method for making them. These compositions and methods of the invention are significant improvements in the field of macromolecule-lipid complex processing, macromolecule targeting and delivery to various biological systems.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A61K 47/48 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 47/6911 (2017.07); B82Y 5/00 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 9518863 A1 19950713 - RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al
- [X] US 5459127 A 19951017 - FELGNER PHILIP L [US], et al
- [DX] GERSHON H ET AL: "MODE OF FORMATION AND STRUCTURAL FEATURES OF DNA-CATIONIC LIPOSOME COMPLEXES USED FOR TRANSFECTION", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, vol. 32, no. 28, 20 July 1993 (1993-07-20), pages 7143 - 7151, XP000601477, ISSN: 0006-2960
- [DX] ZHU N ET AL: "SYSTEMIC GENE EXPRESSION AFTER INTRAVENOUS DNA DELIVERY INTO ADULT MICE", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 261, no. 5118, 9 July 1993 (1993-07-09), pages 209 - 211, XP001068973, ISSN: 0036-8075
- [X] STERNBERG B: "MORPHOLOGY OF CATIONIC LIPOSOME/DNA COMPLEXES IN RELATION TO THEIR CHEMICAL COMPOSITION", JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH, MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, US, vol. 6, no. 3, 1 August 1996 (1996-08-01), pages 515 - 533, XP002048618, ISSN: 0898-2104
- [X] LIU F ET AL: "NEW CATIONIC LIPID FORMULATIONS FOR GENE TRANSFER", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 13, no. 12, 1 December 1996 (1996-12-01), pages 1856 - 1860, XP002045397, ISSN: 0724-8741
- See references of WO 9824936A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9824936 A1 19980611; AU 5593698 A 19980629; EP 0958380 A1 19991124; EP 0958380 A4 20040317
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9722296 W 19971205; AU 5593698 A 19971205; EP 97952293 A 19971205