Global Patent Index - EP 0958473 B1

EP 0958473 B1 2003-06-25 - PRESSURE CONTAINER FOR FLUIDS

Title (en)

PRESSURE CONTAINER FOR FLUIDS

Title (de)

DRUCKBEHÄLTER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

CONTENANT SOUS PRESSION DESTINE A DES FLUIDES

Publication

EP 0958473 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902308 A

Priority

  • NO 9800026 W
  • NO 970449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834063A1] Pressure container for fluids, such as propane and butane, comprinsing an inner, fluid-tight liner layer (1) and a pressure supporting layer (2) outside the liner, as well as an outer, protective casing (5). As known per se the said layers (1, 2) consist of transparent or translucent materials, and the casing (5) comprises a middle section (7) having surface portions (7A, 7B, 7C) being cut-away so that parts of the actual container (3), being located inside the casing (5), are visible from the outside, and that the casing has shock-absorbing properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 1/02; F17C 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/02 (2006.01); F17C 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/02 (2013.01); F17C 1/16 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2201/032 (2013.01); F17C 2201/058 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0604 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0619 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0658 (2013.01); F17C 2203/066 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0663 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0697 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0115 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0165 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0169 (2013.01); F17C 2205/018 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0323 (2013.01); F17C 2205/05 (2013.01); F17C 2209/2118 (2013.01); F17C 2221/035 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2223/033 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0413 (2013.01); F17C 2260/015 (2013.01); F17C 2260/02 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0709 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0745 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834063 A1 19980806; AT 243826 T 20030715; AU 5886698 A 19980825; DE 69815818 D1 20030731; DE 69815818 T2 20040513; DK 0958473 T3 20030929; EP 0958473 A1 19991124; EP 0958473 B1 20030625; ES 2202803 T3 20040401; NO 306226 B1 19991004; NO 970449 A 19980803; NO 970449 D0 19970131; PT 958473 E 20031128

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180206

2018-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180127

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 243826 T

- Effective date: 20180127

2018-03-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-02-21 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2018-02-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180126

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-29 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180127

2018-01-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69815818

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20030625

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-15 [REG NL MF] ANNULMENT TRIGGERED BY 3RD PARTY (E.G. OPPOSITION)

- Free text: REGISTRATION OF INVALIDITY DECLARATION FINAL DECISION, TOTAL ANNULMENT

- Effective date: 20170222

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RAGASCO AS

- Free text: RAGASCO AS#P.O. BOX 50#2831 RAUFOSS (NO) -TRANSFER TO- RAGASCO AS#P.O. BOX 50#2831 RAUFOSS (NO)

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202803 T3

2004-03-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-27 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RAGASCO AS

- Free text: RAUFOSS COMPOSITES AS#P.O. BOX 50#2831 RAUFOSS (NO) -TRANSFER TO- RAGASCO AS#P.O. BOX 50#2831 RAUFOSS (NO)

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: RAGASCO AS

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: RAGASCO AS

2003-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RAGASCO AS

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403802

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815818 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JENSEN, GAUTE

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE