Global Patent Index - EP 0958635 B1

EP 0958635 B1 2002-11-13 - ANTENNA WITH VARIABLE GEOMETRY

Title (en)

ANTENNA WITH VARIABLE GEOMETRY

Title (de)

ANTENNE MIT VARIABLER GEOMETRIE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A GEOMETRIE VARIABLE

Publication

EP 0958635 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98910784 A

Priority

  • FR 9800232 W
  • FR 9701428 A
  • FR 9800245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2759498A1] The invention concerns antennae whose dimensions can be modified so as to modify their radioelectric characteristics. The antenna comprises aligned conductor sections (11, 12) coupled by switching means (2) with remote control by electrically insulating connecting means transparent to radioelectric waves. The switching means are selected on the basis of their capacity for supporting high power or high voltage. One method consists in sending the command through optic fibres (F1, F2) so that they reach a relay (R) via photovoltaic cells (21, 22) located near this relay. The invention is mainly applicable to antennae operating on frequencies lower than 1 GHz.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/24 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 5/02 (2006.01); H01Q 9/18 (2006.01); H01Q 9/30 (2006.01); H01Q 9/32 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/14 (2013.01); H01Q 3/247 (2013.01); H01Q 5/48 (2013.01); H01Q 9/18 (2013.01); H01Q 9/30 (2013.01); H01Q 9/32 (2013.01); H01Q 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2759498 A1 19980814; FR 2759498 B1 19990827; AU 6503898 A 19980826; CA 2279987 A1 19980813; DE 69809392 D1 20021219; DE 69809392 T2 20030821; EP 0958635 A1 19991124; EP 0958635 B1 20021113; US 6195065 B1 20010227; WO 9835402 A1 19980813

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180205

2018-02-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180205

2018-02-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69809392

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809392 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990818

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE