Global Patent Index - EP 0958775 A3

EP 0958775 A3 2000-07-19 - Shower cubicle with retractable walls

Title (en)

Shower cubicle with retractable walls

Title (de)

Duschkabine mit zurückziehbaren Wänden

Title (fr)

Cabine de douche à murs rétractables

Publication

EP 0958775 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201408 A

Priority

IT RE980056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0958775A2] Shower cubicle (1) comprising at least one wall consisting of a roll-up curtain (9) extending between two parallel vertical fixed uprights (4,5), one of which comprises the roller about which the curtain (9) is roiled, these being joined together at their top and bottom by two identical opposing parallel horizontal guides (6,6') having a groove for receiving the upper and lower edges of the curtain (9), and on which there slides a rigid operating bar (12) provided on the front edge of the curtain (9) and able to maintain this latter taut even where its upper and lower edges are not secured to the horizontal guides (6,6'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; A47K 3/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0958775 A2 19991124; EP 0958775 A3 20000719; IT 1304285 B1 20010313; IT RE980056 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/22 A, 7A 47K 3/38 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI