Global Patent Index - EP 0958867 A3

EP 0958867 A3 2001-05-02 - Strip winding apparatus

Title (en)

Strip winding apparatus

Title (de)

Dünnbandwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enroulement d'une bande

Publication

EP 0958867 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109588 A

Priority

US 8212398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0958867A2] The flap guide (20) can selectively be moved into at least two positions. In a first position, the guide locates on at least one of the clamp rollers (10,12) so that it impedes it. The band (14) is thus forced to deviate from a normal path in order at an angle to follow a path to the winding pin (16) and a second position in which the guide does not locate on the clamp roller. This process prevents unnecessary wear or groove formation on the surface of the clamp rollers during winding after the band has been brought into engagement with the winding pin and wound around it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0958867 A2 19991124; EP 0958867 A3 20010502; EP 0958867 B1 20070627; AT 365593 T 20070715; DE 59914389 D1 20070809; ES 2293703 T3 20080316; US 6039283 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180629

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-10-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HYLSA S.A. DE C.V., SAN NICOLAS DE LOS GARZA, MX

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HYLSA S.A. DE C.V., SAN NICOLAS DE LOS GARZA, NUEVO LEON, MX; SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59914389

2015-10-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HYLSA S.A. DE C.V., SAN NICOLAS DE LOS GARZA, NUEVO LEON, MX; SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59914389

2015-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914389

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2293703 T3

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071004

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914389 P 20070809

2007-07-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030730

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYLSA, S.A. DE C.V.

1999-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990514

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI