Global Patent Index - EP 0958868 A3

EP 0958868 A3 2000-09-20 - Device for connecting flat components

Title (en)

Device for connecting flat components

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden flächiger Teile

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'assemblage de pièces plates

Publication

EP 0958868 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109778 A

Priority

DE 19822226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0958868A2] A distortion unit (5) is insertable in the free end (8) of the tube (4), which comprises a clamp device (6) for internal tension of the tube and a tractive device (7) for drawing the tensioned tube against a mouthpiece (9) bordering the free end of the tube. The clamp device is a bracing dowel (10) pressable against the tube inner wall and the tractive device is a drawbar (11) drawing the dowel in the direction of the mouthpiece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 19/12; B21C 47/28; B21D 39/06; B21J 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/28 (2006.01); B21J 15/02 (2006.01); B21J 15/04 (2006.01); B65H 75/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/28 (2013.01); B21J 15/02 (2013.01); B21J 15/046 (2013.01); B65H 75/14 (2013.01); B65H 2402/414 (2013.01); B65H 2701/515 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0958868 A2 19991124; EP 0958868 A3 20000920; DE 19822226 A1 19991209; DE 19822226 C2 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU SE

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21D 19/12 A, 7B 21J 15/02 B, 7B 21C 47/28 B, 7B 21D 39/06 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI