Global patent index - EP 0958926 A3

EP 0958926 A3 2000-02-02 - Printer comprising a tiltable print head for printing at least two lines

Title (en)

Printer comprising a tiltable print head for printing at least two lines

Title (de)

Druckgerät mit einem schwenkbaren Druckkopf für den Druck von wenigstens zwei Zeilen

Title (fr)

Imprimante comportant une tête d'impression basculante pour imprimer au moins deux lignes

Publication

EP 0958926 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109653 A

Priority

DE 19822423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0958926A2] The printer (1) has a print head (3) movable in the direction of the print lines, whereby the print material can be printed with at least two lines without its position changing. The print head can be pivoted about an axis (13) parallel to the print lines by an angle corresponding to the separation of the printed lines. The head is pivoted by one line interval at the end of a line and fixed in the pivoted position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/51; B41J 3/36; B41J 25/316

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/51 (2006.01); B41J 19/14 (2006.01); B41J 25/308 (2006.01); B41J 25/316 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/001 (2013.01); B41J 19/14 (2013.01); B41J 25/005 (2013.01); B41J 25/308 (2013.01); B41J 25/3082 (2013.01); B41J 25/316 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4008794 A 19770222 - DECKER HERBERT
  • [A] US 4613248 A 19860923 - IWASE TAKAYUKI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 532 (M - 1051) 22 November 1990 (1990-11-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0958926 A2 19991124; EP 0958926 A3 20000202; EP 0958926 B1 20011024; DE 19822423 A1 19991125; DE 19822423 C2 20010816; ES 2167110 T3 20020501

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130516

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120309

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100515

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100515

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2167110

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-01-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900335

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-29

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-10-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011024

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 2/51 A, 7B 41J 25/316 B, 7B 41J 3/36 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI