Global Patent Index - EP 0958981 B1

EP 0958981 B1 2002-09-11 - Two vehicles or vehicle parts flexibly connected to each other, especially between two motor cars flexibly connected to each other, with an inter-communication diaphram.

Title (en)

Two vehicles or vehicle parts flexibly connected to each other, especially between two motor cars flexibly connected to each other, with an inter-communication diaphram.

Title (de)

Zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundene Fahrzeuge bzw. Fahrzeugteile, insbesondere zwischen zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundene Triebwagen, mit einem Übergang.

Title (fr)

Deux véhicules ou parties de véhicule reliés de manière articulée entre-eux, notamment entre deux autorails reliés de manière articulée, avec une inter-circulation.

Publication

EP 0958981 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108969 A

Priority

EP 98108969 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0958981A1] A housing (50) is arranged on the face side of each vehicle and accommodates the bellows (10) and bridge (30) of the transition half (1). The housing is closable. The bellows of each transition half has a support frame (40) which is displaceably located in the housing. This frame is equipped with rollers (41,42) and is supported in relation to the housing by an articulated lever (43). Each bellows has a coupling frame (20) for connection with the other bellows. The member bridge (30) is foldable around a horizontal axis into the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0958981 A1 19991124; EP 0958981 B1 20020911; DE 59805506 D1 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170516

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170516

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805506

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805506 20021017

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TWO VEHICLES OR VEHICLE PARTS FLEXIBLY CONNECTED TO EACH OTHER, ESPECIALLY BETWEEN TWO MOTOR CARS FLEXIBLY CONNECTED TO EACH OTHER, WITH AN INTER-COMMUNICATION DIAPHRAM.

2002-02-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TWO VEHICLES OR VEHICLE PARTS FLEXIBLY CONNECTED TO EACH OTHER, ESPECIALLY BETWEEN TWO MOTOR CARS FLEXIBLY CONNECTED TO EACH OTHER, WITH AN INTER-COMMUNICATION DIAPHRAM.

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI