Global Patent Index - EP 0959005 A3

EP 0959005 A3 2000-10-25 - Metering valve

Title (en)

Metering valve

Title (de)

Dosierventil

Title (fr)

Robinet de dosage

Publication

EP 0959005 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109419 A

Priority

DE 19822430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959005A2] A dosing pump has a dosing valve used in association with jam, yoghurt, and other similar edible semi-liquid substances. The valve inlet (9) and outlet (10) passages within the housing (2) are located essentially facing the pump inlet/outlet (11). The openings (9', 10') to the inlet (9) and outlet (10) are separated by a cross-piece (12) in the cylindrical adjustable plane (ZE) closing surface (6) within the cam (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 39/00; F04B 7/00; F04B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 7/00 (2006.01); F04B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 7/0011 (2013.01); F04B 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959005 A2 19991124; EP 0959005 A3 20001025; EP 0959005 B1 20040317; DE 19822430 C1 20000210; US 6179587 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040617

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010217

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 39/00 A, 7F 04B 7/00 B, 7F 04B 13/00 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI