Global Patent Index - EP 0959017 A3

EP 0959017 A3 2000-04-12 - Container for liquids

Title (en)

Container for liquids

Title (de)

Behälter für Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Récipient pour liquides

Publication

EP 0959017 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109904 A

Priority

DE 29809329 U

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B65D 1/04; B65D 21/02; B65D 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/08 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0085 (2013.01); B65D 23/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809329 U1 19990128; EP 0959017 A2 19991124; EP 0959017 A3 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65D 71/00 A, 7B 65D 23/08 B, 7B 65D 1/04 B, 7B 65D 21/02 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI