Global Patent Index - EP 0959035 A3

EP 0959035 A3 2000-08-16 - Spooler device

Title (en)

Spooler device

Title (de)

Haspel

Title (fr)

Dévidoir

Publication

EP 0959035 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303827 A

Priority

  • GB 9810694 A
  • GB 9902189 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959035A2] A spooler device comprises a housing (1) mounted on a base structure (2) about a pivot (5) such that housing (1) is able to rotate about pivot (5) relative to base structure (2). Flexible elongate material (4) is fed through guiding means (3), guiding means (3) being typically attached to base structure (2), such that when material (4) is urged along its length into housing (1), housing (1) rotates in one direction and material (4) is coiled at least initially against the inner radial wall of housing (1). Also, when material (4) is urged away from housing (1), such material (4) being retracted through guiding means 3, housing (1) rotates in the other direction and material (4) is uncoiled out of housing (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 49/28; B65H 75/36; B65H 75/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/28 (2006.01); B65H 75/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/364 (2013.01); B65H 49/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959035 A2 19991124; EP 0959035 A3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020926

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-05-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI