Global Patent Index - EP 0959156 A3

EP 0959156 A3 2001-03-14 - Unit for feeding and pre-treating the fibrous material fed to a textile machine, particularly for openers or cotton carders

Title (en)

Unit for feeding and pre-treating the fibrous material fed to a textile machine, particularly for openers or cotton carders

Title (de)

Einheit zum Liefern und Vorbehandeln des Fasermaterials geliefert an eine Textilmaschine, insbesondere an Oeffner oder an Baumwollkarden

Title (fr)

Unité d'alimentation et de prétraitement de matériau fibreuse alimenté à une machine textile, en particulier à ouvreuses ou à cardes de type coton

Publication

EP 0959156 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201533 A

Priority

IT MI981097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959156A2] The opening and pre-feed roller (11) is equipped with a first (18) and a second (19) toothed clothing of helical development. They are disposed adjacently and in such a way that the respective teeth (24, 25) have opposed inclination, and enable the fibres to be processed to be uniformly fed to the machine in the form of a pad of well opened flakes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 9/06; D01G 15/20; D01G 15/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 9/06 (2006.01); D01G 15/20 (2006.01); D01G 15/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 9/06 (2013.01); D01G 15/20 (2013.01); D01G 15/88 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959156 A2 19991124; EP 0959156 A3 20010314; IT 1299586 B1 20000316; IT MI981097 A1 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010915

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI