Global patent index - EP 0959161 A3

EP 0959161 A3 2001-01-03 - Method for making a knitted article on a knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making a knitted article on a knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestrickstücks auf einer Strickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un article tricoté dans un métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 0959161 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108128 A

Priority

DE 19822321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959161A2] The required length of yarn (10) per course is determined by a computer program from the length of the stitch elements (1a,1b,2a) and number of stitches. This is compared with the actual length of yarn used as measured and the machine settings are corrected accordingly during the knitting process to give the correct final size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/66 (2013.01); D04B 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959161 A2 19991124; EP 0959161 A3 20010103; EP 0959161 B1 20040811; DE 19822321 A1 19991125; ES 2224487 T3 20050301

INPADOC legal status

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140424

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130406

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060425

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224487

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STOLL,THOMAS

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HERMANN, JUERGEN

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FRIES, HORST

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHINDLER,FRANK

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI