Global Patent Index - EP 0959190 A3

EP 0959190 A3 2000-02-23 - Heat insulation element

Title (en)

Heat insulation element

Title (de)

Wärmedämmelement

Title (fr)

Elément d'isolation thermique

Publication

EP 0959190 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108797 A

Priority

DE 29808924 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959190A2] The element consists of a core panel (2) with two large upper surfaces (3,4), and cover layers (5) located on the upper surfaces. The core panel consists of a material whose density is less than the density of the cover layer, whereby the cover layers are compression-proof in the direction normal to the surface. The core panel consists of a hard foam such as expanded polysterol or polyurethane, and has a density of between 15 and 20 kg/m<3>. The cover layers are non-positively connected to the core panel using e.g. adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/22; E04B 1/80; E04B 7/20; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/80 (2006.01); E04C 2/296 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/80 (2013.01); E04C 2/296 (2013.01); E04B 2001/7683 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29808924 U1 19980903; AT 304091 T 20050915; DE 59912514 D1 20051013; DK 0959190 T3 20060116; EP 0959190 A2 19991124; EP 0959190 A3 20000223; EP 0959190 B1 20050907

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912514

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S, DK

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH AND CO. OHG, DE

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-06 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150424

2015-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150122 AND 20150128

2014-09-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S, DK

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH + CO OHG, 45966 GLADBECK, DE

- Document: DE 59912514

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912514

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912514

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-01-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-12-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051218

2005-12-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912514 P 20051013

2005-10-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 7/22 A, 7E 04D 13/16 B, 7E 04B 1/80 B, 7E 04B 7/20 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI