Global patent index - EP 0959194 A3

EP 0959194 A3 2001-01-17 - Folding device

Title (en)

Folding device

Title (de)

Biegevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage

Publication

EP 0959194 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108756 A

Priority

DE 19822389 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959194A2] The blade (16) is fitted on an operating lever (22) and is limitedly pivotable around an axis parallel to the profile. The support frame (11) is provided with a locator (17), preferably beneath the blade, for the profile to be machined. The locator in the direction of the blade is height-adjustably fitted, preferably in a staged manner, on the support frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 15/04; E04D 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/15 (2006.01); E04D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/15 (2013.01); E04D 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959194 A2 19991124; EP 0959194 A3 20010117; DE 19822389 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORUS ALUMINIUM PROFILTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI