Global Patent Index - EP 0959209 B1

EP 0959209 B1 2002-11-20 - Fitting and method of fixing it to a window or door profile

Title (en)

Fitting and method of fixing it to a window or door profile

Title (de)

Beschlagteil und Arbeitsverfahren zu seiner Anordnung an einem Fenster- oder Türprofil

Title (fr)

Ferrure et son procédé de fixation sur un profilé de fenêtre ou de porte

Publication

EP 0959209 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108830 A

Priority

DE 19822863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959209A1] The groove is parallel with the front side of the building window or door profile and has a back and front wall, and through-hole for a fastening. The arm (2) of the fitting (1) extending into the groove (7) has a lug (5) extending towards one groove-wall (6). The total width of the arm is slightly wider than the opening width of the groove. The lug fits into a notch (8) in the groove. The arm is molded from a base plate (9) of the fitting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05B 17/0012 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959209 A1 19991124; EP 0959209 B1 20021120; AT 228197 T 20021215; DE 19822863 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903444

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120504

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228197 T

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110504

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903444 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228197 T 20021215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI