Global Patent Index - EP 0959297 A3

EP 0959297 A3 2001-05-02 - Lighting mat

Title (en)

Lighting mat

Title (de)

Lichtmatte

Title (fr)

Tapis lumineux

Publication

EP 0959297 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109745 A

Priority

  • DE 29809093 U
  • DE 29903010 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959297A2] A light mat (1) for electrically illuminating objects (2) which are spread out, e.g. buildings, ships, landscape, etc. comprises numerous electric light sources (6) connected to an electricity supply. The light sources are located in or on a flexible or partially flexible layered member (3) with a base layer (4). The electricity supply is located on or in the layer member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 57/00 (2006.01); B63B 45/00 (2006.01); F21K 99/00 (2010.01); F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21S 10/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/22 (2006.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 19/22 (2013.01); A63B 57/357 (2015.10); A63B 57/40 (2015.10); B63B 45/00 (2013.01); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21S 10/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/04 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21V 33/006 (2013.01); F21V 33/008 (2013.01); A63B 2207/00 (2013.01); A63B 2207/02 (2013.01); F21W 2121/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959297 A2 19991124; EP 0959297 A3 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19990723

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI