Global Patent Index - EP 0959318 A3

EP 0959318 A3 2000-10-11 - Locking system for a gun

Title (en)

Locking system for a gun

Title (de)

Versperrbare Halterung für Schusswaffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour arme à feu

Publication

EP 0959318 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890054 A

Priority

AT 33498 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959318A2] A security lock for the safe storage of rifles or hand guns has an upper fitting with a pin (1) on a pivot mounting to locate into the muzzle of the weapon. A lower bracket is hinged on fitting and grips around the hand grip, or around the stock, of the weapon. The lower catch is secured by a key operated security lock (12). The user pushes the muzzle onto the pin and swings the weapon onto the lower fitting. The catch is secured over the hand grip and snaps shut. The upper mounting has a limited lateral slide adjustment to align the weapon in the fitting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/44; A47B 81/00; F41A 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01); F41A 23/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/005 (2013.01); F41A 23/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959318 A2 19991124; EP 0959318 A3 20001011; AT 3146 U1 19991025; CA 2272529 A1 19991120

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 17/44 A, 7A 47B 81/00 B, 7F 41A 23/18 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI