Global Patent Index - EP 0959320 B1

EP 0959320 B1 2003-06-18 - Clamping device for a muzzle mirror

Title (en)

Clamping device for a muzzle mirror

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für einen Mündungsspiegel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour un miroir de volée

Publication

EP 0959320 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99107739 A

Priority

FR 9806350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959320A1] The flight mirror (4) is fixed to one end of the artillery gun barrel by a support (3) with two flanges (3a,3b) surrounding the barrel. The flanges are housed in a groove (2) in the barrel and connected to rotate with it by a cotter pin (14). A centralizing collar (19) with two jaws has a conical bearing surface (25) engaging a complementary conical bearing surface (17) on the flanges so that the clamping of the jaws ensures axial and radial holding of the flanges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959320 A1 19991124; EP 0959320 B1 20030618; DE 69908861 D1 20030724; DE 69908861 T2 20040506; FR 2778736 A1 19991119; FR 2778736 B1 20000616; US 6178648 B1 20010130; ZA 9903363 B 19991110

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140419

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908861

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140419

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908861

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908861 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI