Global Patent Index - EP 0959442 A3

EP 0959442 A3 2000-10-04 - Method of transmitting vehicle data information and traffic information system

Title (en)

Method of transmitting vehicle data information and traffic information system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Informationsübertragung von Fahrzeugdaten und Verkehrsinformationssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé de transmission d'information sur les données relatives à un véhicule et système d'information sur le trafic

Publication

EP 0959442 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99440105 A

Priority

DE 19822914 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959442A2] The method involves transferring information and displaying vehicle data acquired by sensors, especially speed, lighting conditions, ABS triggering, steering wheel turning, position. A mobile radio network is used and the data transmitted are blended into the front windscreen of the vehicle (1a-1h;2a-2e). The data are divided into priority classes which are transmitted and/or displayed depending on parameters, especially speed. An Independent claim is also included for traffic information system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09; G08G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/26 (2006.01); B60W 30/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/163 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959442 A2 19991124; EP 0959442 A3 20001004; EP 0959442 B1 20040825; DE 19822914 A1 19991125; JP 2000030178 A 20000128; US 6369720 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170511

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170511

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170512

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170511

2018-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910319

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140717

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910319 P 20040930

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08G 1/09 A, 7G 08G 1/16 B

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILHELM, MICHAEL

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI