Global Patent Index - EP 0959481 A3

EP 0959481 A3 2000-08-09 - Ignition coil for ignition systems

Title (en)

Ignition coil for ignition systems

Title (de)

Zündspule für Zündanlagen

Title (fr)

Bobine d'allumage pour systèmes d'allumage

Publication

EP 0959481 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100806 A

Priority

DE 19822560 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959481A2] The ignition coil has at least one winding set (17) mounted in a casing (19) and at least one end stage (31). The end stage is mounted in a casing part that is at least partly separated from the rest of the casing by an isolating element (27) for thermal decoupling. The isolating element may be an air gap with a bridging element (29) of a poorly thermally conducting plastics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959481 A2 19991124; EP 0959481 A3 20000809; DE 19822560 A1 19991125; JP H11345727 A 19991214

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI