Global Patent Index - EP 0959484 A3

EP 0959484 A3 2000-08-09 - Shielding for differential transformer assembly for earth fault circuit breaker

Title (en)

Shielding for differential transformer assembly for earth fault circuit breaker

Title (de)

Abschirmung für Summenstrom-Wandleranordnung für Fehlerstrom-Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Blindage pour dispositif transformateur différentiel pour disjoncteur de défaut à la terre

Publication

EP 0959484 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108970 A

Priority

DE 19822515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959484A2] A summation current transformer arrangement for a primary current lead includes a toroidal core (14) with secondary winding (16), in which the toroidal core and secondary winding are arranged within a screen (140) made of high-permeability material, the screen being slotted (141). For alternating current (AC) drive, the effective active screening factor is increased by selection of a material for the screening, which in addition is also electrically of high resistance. More specifically, the screening consists of a high permeability, sintered material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959484 A2 19991124; EP 0959484 A3 20000809; DE 19822515 A1 19991209; DE 19822515 C2 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031201

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI