Global Patent Index - EP 0959531 A3

EP 0959531 A3 2001-03-07 - Single piece electrical receptacle terminal

Title (en)

Single piece electrical receptacle terminal

Title (de)

Einstückige elektrische Anschlussbuchse

Title (fr)

Borne électrique femelle d'un seul tenant

Publication

EP 0959531 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109536 A

Priority

  • EP 99109536 A
  • EP 98401196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959531A2] A single piece electrical receptacle terminal (2) comprises a contact section (6) in the form of a box having a front wall (18) and short mating end side wall portions (30) extending from the front wall (18). The side wall portions (30) assist in providing a robust box and protect the contact area, yet require little material and generate little scrap. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/11; H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959531 A2 19991124; EP 0959531 A3 20010307; EP 0959531 B1 20060726

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69932471

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070512

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070512

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932471 P 20060907

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI