Global Patent Index - EP 0959534 A3

EP 0959534 A3 2001-01-03 - Electrical connector, in particular for ground connection

Title (en)

Electrical connector, in particular for ground connection

Title (de)

Elektrisches Verbindungselement, insbesondere elektrisches Masseverbindungselement

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique, en particulier pour la mise à la terre

Publication

EP 0959534 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109975 A

Priority

DE 19823008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959534A2] The connector (1) has a base body (2) of a non-noble metal, e.g. steel, or of a noble metal, e.g. silver or gold, or has a coating of one of these metals, and can be inserted in or mounted on a component (G) made of magnesium or magnesium alloy at least in a contact region (3). The contact element is coated with tin or a tin alloy, at least in the region (4) in contact with the magnesium or magnesium alloy component, with a thickness of at least 15 micro m. An Independent claim is also included for an earthing design for a motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/648; H01R 4/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/648 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959534 A2 19991124; EP 0959534 A3 20010103; EP 0959534 B1 20030219; DE 19823008 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-01-26 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59904309

- Effective date: 20111203

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-05-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904309 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/648 A, 7H 01R 4/62 B

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI