Global Patent Index - EP 0959538 A3

EP 0959538 A3 2001-04-11 - Method of manufacturing an electrical connector

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing an electrical connector

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines elektrischen Verbinders

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0959538 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109801 A

Priority

US 8322298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959538A2] A method is provided for manufacturing an electrical connector module (12). The method includes the steps of stamping from conductive sheet metal material a blank (36) including a plurality of circuits (18). At least two of the circuits are joined by a web (38) of the sheet metal material. The stamped blank (36) is placed into a first molding die (46). A second molding die (58) is closed onto the first molding die and the web (38) is concurrently sheared. A dielectric housing (16) is molded about portions of the sheared circuits (18) to form the connector module (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/16; H01R 43/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/16 (2006.01); H01R 43/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/16 (2013.01); H01R 43/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 4965933 A 19901030 - MRAZ JAMES E [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959538 A2 19991124; EP 0959538 A3 20010411; CN 1237019 A 19991201; JP 3092067 B2 20000925; JP H11345675 A 19991214; TW 451534 B 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI