Global patent index - EP 0959795 A4

EP 0959795 A4 2000-01-19 - FILMS HAVING IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE

Title (en)

FILMS HAVING IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE

Title (de)

FILME MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UNDGEBRAUCH

Title (fr)

FILMS POSSEDANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES AMELIOREES ET PROCEDES POUR LEUR PREPARATION ET DE LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0959795 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97910940 A

Priority

  • US 9718518 W
  • US 2880796 P
  • US 79574497 A
  • US 89015497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9816165A1] Examplary gelating films comprise cross linked and non-cross linked granular and non-granular gelating sheets, typically including a plasticizer, and optionally including a cross-linking agent incorporated within or over one or more surfaces of the film. The gelating films are dry, thin, and preferably meet certain pliability, elasticity, melting temperature, and other criteria. Methods are described for producing these films from collagen. Methods are further described for applying these films to tissue with and without the application of energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 15/32; A61L 25/00; A61L 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 24/10 (2006.01); A61L 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 31/045 (2013.01); A61L 24/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9816165 A1 19980423; AU 4819897 A 19980511; EP 0959795 A1 19991201; EP 0959795 A4 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-01-26 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7A 61L 15/32 A, 7A 61L 25/00 B, 7A 61L 31/00 B

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990420

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL