Global Patent Index - EP 0959797 A4

EP 0959797 A4 2000-07-26 - ENDOSCOPE CABINET

Title (en)

ENDOSCOPE CABINET

Title (de)

SCHRANK FÜR EIN ENDOSKOP

Title (fr)

ARMOIRE POUR ENDOSCOPE

Publication

EP 0959797 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97953127 A

Priority

  • US 9722621 W
  • US 3303996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9825569A2] A method of storing an endoscopic instrument or the like in a cavity located within a cabinet having a door that allows access to the instrument within the cavity. The method involves opening the door so as to reveal the cavity and inserting an endoscopic instrument or the like within the revealed cavity. The door is then closed so as to deny access to the cavity. Next, the ambient atmosphere is allowed to flow within the closed cabinet so as to allow the ambient atmosphere to dry the endoscopic instrument or the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 19/02; E06B 9/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01); A61B 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 50/10 (2016.02); A61B 2050/105 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9825569 A2 19980618; WO 9825569 A3 19990107; AU 5693398 A 19980703; BR 9713698 A 20010306; CN 1245546 A 20000223; EP 0959797 A2 19991201; EP 0959797 A4 20000726; JP 2001508328 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1020670

2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 19/02 A, 7E 06B 9/11 B

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE