Global Patent Index - EP 0959883 A4

EP 0959883 A4 2001-05-09 - INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (de)

INHIBITOREN DER FARNESYL-PROTEIN-TRANSFERASE

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE LA FARNESYLE-PROTEINE TRANSFERASE

Publication

EP 0959883 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97917711 A

Priority

  • GB 9610654 A
  • US 9705170 W
  • US 1466896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736583A1] The present invention is directed to compounds which inhibit farnesyl-protein transferase (FTase) and the farnesylation of the oncogene protein Ras. The invention is further directed to chemotherapeutic compositions containing the compounds of this invention and methods for inhibiting farnesyl-protein transferase and the farnesylation of the oncogene protein Ras.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/415; C07D 233/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/64 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/57 (2006.01); C07D 521/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2013.01); C07D 213/57 (2013.01); C07D 233/56 (2013.01); C07D 249/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PY] WO 9637204 A1 19961128 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [PY] WO 9630343 A1 19961003 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9729092 A1 19970814 - BLACK JAMES FOUNDATION [GB], et al
  • [PY] WO 9639137 A1 19961212 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [X] US 3497591 A 19700224 - YANKELL SAMUEL L, et al
  • [X] DE 3219113 A1 19831124 - BAYER AG [DE]
  • [X] US 5447728 A 19950905 - MILSTEIN SAM J [US], et al
  • [X] A. T. UNG, S. G. PYNE: "Synthesis of fluorescent and biotinylated analogues of (1R,2S,3R)-2-acetyl-4(5)-(1,2,3,4-tetrahydroxybutyl)imidazole", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 37, no. 34, 1996, pages 6209 - 6212, XP002030837
  • [X] H. B. MILNE, C.-H. PENG: "The Use of Benzylsulfonyl Chloride in Peptide Syntheses", J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., vol. 79, no. 3, 1957, pages 639 - 644, XP002030836
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 56, no. 5, 5 March 1962, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 4863e, S. B. SEREBRYANYI ET AL.: "Esters of N(alpha)-arylsulfonyl amino acids" page 1962; XP002030844 & KHIM. ZHUR., vol. 27, 1981, pages 365 - 369KHIM. ZHUR.198127365369
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 13, 30 September 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 101248n, page 293; XP002030842 & ANAL. BIOCHEM., vol. 148, no. 2, 1985, pages 365 - 375ANAL. BIOCHEM.19851482365375
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 25, 22 June 1987, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 210288h, O. S. RESHETOVA ET AL.: "Analysis of N-dansyl peptide methyl esters by means of high performance liquid chromatography and mass spectrometry" page 326; XP002030841 & BIOORG. KHIM., vol. 13, no. 3, 1987, pages 320 - 337BIOORG. KHIM.1987133320337
  • [X] A. WARSHAWSKY ET AL.: "Ring Cleavage of N-Acyl- and N-(Arylsulfonyl)histamines with Di-tert-butyl Dicarbonate. A One-Pot Synthesis of 4-Acylamino- and 4-Arylsulfonylamino-1,2-diaminobutanes", SYNTHESIS, no. 11, 1989, pages 825 - 829, XP002030834
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 18, 29 October 1990, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 164723r, A. I. TOCHILIN, I. N. GRACHEVA: "8-Methoxy-5-quinolinesulfonyl chloride, a new fluorogenic reagent for the detection of amines and amino acids" page 864; XP002030840 & BIOORG. KHIM., vol. 16, no. 7, 1990, pages 956 - 962BIOORG. KHIM.1990167956962
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 117, no. 16, 19 October 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 163157e, S. H. LEE ET AL.: "Systematic study on the resolution of derivatized amino acids enantiomers on different cyclodextrin-bonded stationary phases" page 853; XP002030838 & J. CHROMATOGR., vol. 603, no. 1-2, 1992, pages 83 - 93J. CHROMATOGR.19926031-28393
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 24, 15 June 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 247605s, H. NISHIZAWA ET AL.: "Enantioseparation of N-dansyl-DL-amino acids by polyacrylamide gel zone electrophoresis" page 855; XP002030839 & ANAL. SCI., vol. 7, no. 6, 1991, pages 959 - 961ANAL. SCI.199176959961
  • [X] L. BAUMANN, T. INGVALDSEN: "Concerning histidine and carnosine. The synthesis of carnosine", J. BIOL. CHEM, vol. 35, 1918, pages 263 - 280, XP002161142
  • [X] M. AMOROSA: "Derivati solfanilamidici dell'istidina", GAZZ. CHIM. ITAL., vol. 71, 1941, pages 343 - 350, XP000984015
  • See also references of WO 9736583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736583 A1 19971009; AU 2596897 A 19971022; AU 715604 B2 20000203; CA 2250143 A1 19971009; EP 0959883 A1 19991201; EP 0959883 A4 20010509; JP 2000507584 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-05-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE