Global Patent Index - EP 0960110 B8

EP 0960110 B8 2002-11-27 - 3-ARYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLO[4,3-d]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES; CORTICOTROPIN-RELEASING FACTOR RECEPTOR (CRF1) SPECIFIC LIGANDS

Title (en)

3-ARYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLO[4,3-d]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES; CORTICOTROPIN-RELEASING FACTOR RECEPTOR (CRF1) SPECIFIC LIGANDS

Title (de)

3-ARYL PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDIN DERIVATE; CORTICOTROPIN AUSLÖSEFAKTOR-REZEPTOR (CRF1) SPEZIFISCHE LIGANDEN

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE PYRAZOLO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDINE A SUBSTITUTION ARYLE EN POSITION 3; LIGANDS SPECIFIQUES AU RECEPTEUR DE FACTEUR LIBERATEUR DE CORTICOTROPHINE (CRF1)

Publication

EP 0960110 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 97954301 A

Priority

  • US 9724172 W
  • US 77540496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5723608A] This invention encompasses compounds of the formula <IMAGE> wherein Ar represents a mono-, di- or trisubstituted aryl group where at least one position on Ar ortho to the point of attachment to the pyrazole ring is substituted; and R1 represents lower alkyl; R2 is hydrogen or lower alkyl; and R3 and R4 independently represent organic and inorganic substituents, which compounds are highly selective partial agonists or antagonists at human CRF1 receptors and are useful in the diagnosis and treatment of treating stress related disorders such as post traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) as well as depression, headache and anxiety.

[origin: US5723608A] This invention encompasses compounds of the formula <IMAGE> wherein Ar represents a mono-, di- or trisubstituted aryl group where at least one position on Ar ortho to the point of attachment to the pyrazole ring is substituted; and R1 represents lower alkyl; R2 is hydrogen or lower alkyl; and R3 and R4 independently represent organic and inorganic substituents, which compounds are highly selective partial agonists or antagonists at human CRF1 receptors and are useful in the diagnosis and treatment of treating stress related disorders such as post traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) as well as depression, headache and anxiety.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 487/04; A61K 31/505

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5723608 A 19980303; AT 214701 T 20020415; AU 5811098 A 19980731; AU 738324 B2 20010913; BR 9713808 A 20000125; CA 2276610 A1 19980709; CN 1100779 C 20030205; CN 1246860 A 20000308; DE 69711241 D1 20020425; DE 69711241 T2 20021212; EP 0960110 A1 19991201; EP 0960110 B1 20020320; EP 0960110 B8 20021127; ES 2172830 T3 20021001; HK 1025958 A1 20030509; IL 130680 D0 20000601; JP 2001507705 A 20010612; KR 20000069827 A 20001125; NO 993240 A 19990827; NO 993240 D0 19990629; NZ 336529 A 20010330; US 6211187 B1 20010403; WO 9829413 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041223

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040202

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-01-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-20 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 3-ARYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLO(4,3-D)PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES; CORTICOTROPIN-RELEASING FACTOR RECEPTOR (CRF1) SPECIFIC LIGANDS

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172830 T3

2002-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69711241 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990714;LT PAYMENT 19990714;LV PAYMENT 19990714;MK PAYMENT 19990714;RO PAYMENT 19990714;SI PAYMENT 19990714

2002-03-20 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214701 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001103

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990714;LT PAYMENT 19990714;LV PAYMENT 19990714;MK PAYMENT 19990714;RO PAYMENT 19990714;SI PAYMENT 19990714