Global patent index - EP 0960159 A4

EP 0960159 A4 2001-04-04 - PRIMER FOR PLASTIC FILMS

Title (en)

PRIMER FOR PLASTIC FILMS

Title (de)

VEREDLUNG VON POLYMERFILMEN

Title (fr)

APPRET POUR FILMS PLASTIQUES

Publication

EP 0960159 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98906258 A

Priority

  • US 9802498 W
  • US 3758597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834982A1] The invention relates to a primer for plastic films which comprises a blend of poly(vinyl alcohol) and an adhesion promoter, specifically poly(ethylene imine) and/or a hardened epoxy resin. The invention is useful to improve the oxygen barrier properties of a plastic film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08K 5/04; C08L 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 7/04 (2006.01); C08G 59/62 (2006.01); C08K 5/07 (2006.01); C08K 5/17 (2006.01); C08L 29/04 (2006.01); C09D 5/00 (2006.01); C09D 129/04 (2006.01); C08L 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/17 (2013.01); C08K 5/07 (2013.01); C09D 129/04 (2013.01); C08L 63/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 5/07 + C08L 29/04
  2. C08K 5/17 + C08L 29/04
  3. C09D 129/04 + C08L 2666/28
  4. C09D 129/04 + C08L 2666/14

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834982 A1 19980813; AR 011658 A1 20000830; AU 6152898 A 19980826; AU 735361 B2 20010705; BR 9807569 A 20000201; CA 2280050 A1 19980813; CN 1246879 A 20000308; EP 0960159 A1 19991201; EP 0960159 A4 20010404; ID 23409 A 20000420; JP 2001511211 A 20010807; KR 20000070911 A 20001125

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL