Global patent index - EP 0960198 A4

EP 0960198 A4 2001-04-25 - CD44-LIKE PROTEIN

Title (en)

CD44-LIKE PROTEIN

Title (de)

CD44-ÄHNLICHES PROTEIN

Title (fr)

PROTEINE DE TYPE CD44

Publication

EP 0960198 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96927373 A

Priority

US 9613008 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/705; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/74; C12N 15/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01); C12N 15/79 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9628549 A2 19960919 - INCYTE PHARMA INC [US]
  • [E] WO 9738098 A1 19971016 - UNIV MANITOBA [CA], et al
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 14 March 1996 (1996-03-14), HILLIER L. ET AL., XP002159439, Database accession no. Accession No: N69434;
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 18 June 1996 (1996-06-18), HILLIER L. ET AL., XP002159440, Database accession no. Accession No. W69477;
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 25 April 1996 (1996-04-25), HILLIER L. ET AL., XP002159441, Database accession no. Accession No. W03259;
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 7 October 1995 (1995-10-07), HILLIER L. ET AL., XP002159442, Database accession no. Accession No. H57840;
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 29 August 1995 (1995-08-29), FUJIWARA T. ET AL., XP002159443, Database accession no. Accession No. D63041;
  • [T] BANERJI SUNEALE ET AL: "LYVE-1, a new homologue of the CD44 glycoprotein, is a lymph-specific receptor for hyaluronan.", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, vol. 144, no. 4, 22 February 1999 (1999-02-22), pages 789 - 801, XP002159438, ISSN: 0021-9525
  • See also references of WO 9806839A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960198 A1 19991201; EP 0960198 A4 20010425

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20060210

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031006

2001-04-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990309

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE